Wise v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosanna Wise
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc., PAX Labs, Inc. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv08301
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:19-cv-06913, filed on 10/24/2019. (sjo)
October 18, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/16/2019) (sjo)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER terminating #14 Letter Motion to Stay. Parties' request to stay this action pending resolutions of JLI's motion before the JPML is granted. Counsel shall provide a status update in writing by Nov. 20, 2019. Clerk of the Court is requested to terminate the motion (doc. 14). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/20/2019) (ks)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay action pending resolution of JUUL Labs, Inc.'s motion before the JPML addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Joseph Evall dated September 19, 2019. Document filed by Juul Labs, Inc..(Evall, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc.. Document filed by Juul Labs, Inc..(Evall, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Declan Thomas Conroy on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc.. (Conroy, Declan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Evall on behalf of Juul Labs, Inc.. (Evall, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philip Morris USA Inc.. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAX Labs, Inc.. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juul Labs, Inc.. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altria Group, Inc.. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Ross Frisch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code - no selection; Citizenship Defendant code - no selection; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Putnam;. (jgo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JUUL Labs, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosanna Wise. (Frisch, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAX Labs, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosanna Wise. (Frisch, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Altria Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosanna Wise. (Frisch, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Philip Morris USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosanna Wise. (Frisch, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Frisch, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17552543)Document filed by Rosanna Wise.(Frisch, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Declan Thomas Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanna Wise
Represented By: Andrew Ross Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?