J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Figueroa et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Defendant: Salvador Figueroa and Trifecta Cuisine Corp.
Case Number: 7:2019cv08445
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from George W. Echevarria dated 10/24/2019 re: Requesting an extension of time of sixty (60) days to December 24, 2019 to answer and/or move with respect to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. No further extensions., Salvador Figueroa answer due 12/24/2019; Trifecta Cuisine Corp. answer due 12/24/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/24/2019) (rj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Trifecta Cuisine Corp. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist of the NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Salvador Figueroa served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. Service was accepted by EDUARDO RAMIREZ (CO-WORKER). Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trifecta Cuisine Corp.. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salvador Figueroa. (pne)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph P. Loughlin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trifecta Cuisine Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Salvador Figueroa, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Salvador Figueroa, Trifecta Cuisine Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17582019)Document filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc..(Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trifecta Cuisine Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?