Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rachel L Bailey
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2019cv08472
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned actions have been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, November 19, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 521, U.S. District Court, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing, at least ten business days beforehand. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/6/2019) (jca)
October 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Toby S Soli on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Soli, Toby)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Post Filor on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Filor, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Richard B. North, Nelson Mullins et al., New Attorney: Daniel P. Filor, Address: Greenberg Traurig, LLP, MetLife Building, 200 Park Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10166, 212-801-9200. Document filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Filor, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:17-cv-6404. (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Arizona; Case Number: 2:16-cv-00600. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Southern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #7 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169269 as to Jaime E Moss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169268 as to Jennifer A Lenze. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 4, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169267 as to Laurie E Kamerrer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Laurie Kamerrer on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer A Lenze on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jaime E Moss on behalf of Rachel L Bailey. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-600-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX169272 filed by Rachel L Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Toby S Soli
Represented By: Daniel Post Filor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Toby S Soli
Represented By: Daniel Post Filor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel L Bailey
Represented By: Jennifer A Lenze
Represented By: Jaime E Moss
Represented By: Laurie E Kamerrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?