United States of America v. Mantz et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, John Doe, Mary Roe, catrina mantz and John Doe, Refused Name
Case Number: 7:2019cv08668
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against catrina mantz, John Doe, Refused Name.Document filed by United States of America. Related document: #4 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LaBletta, Nicole)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. John Doe served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; catrina mantz served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service was accepted by Catrina Mantz. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by United States of America. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Southern District of New York. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Roe. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to XYZ Corporation. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to catrina mantz. (sj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Doe, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Roe, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to XYZ Corporation, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catrina Mantz, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation, catrina mantz. Document filed by United States of America.(LaBletta, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form dated June 2012; each summons request must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole B. LaBletta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicole B. LaBletta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Nature of Suit code 290 (Real Property: Other); Dollar Demand none; County code Orange; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 220 (Real Property: Foreclosure); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $234000; the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin code - no selection; Courthouse Assignment code - no selection; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catrina Mantz, John Doe, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons to John Doe, #2 Summons to Mary Roe, #3 Summons to XYZ Corporation)(LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 9/19/2019 (jgo).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 9/19/2019 (jgo).
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 9/19/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mantz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: catrina mantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Refused Name
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?