The United States of America by and for the use of Ironclad Concepts, LLC v. Arch Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ironclad Concepts, LLC
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv08804
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint served. The United States of America by and for the use of Ironclad Concepts, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The United States of America by and for the use of Ironclad Concepts, LLC. (Pallas, George)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Insurance Company. (jgo)
September 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George E Pallas. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The United States of America by and for the use of Ironclad Concepts, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
September 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney George E Pallas. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1352; County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 40:3131; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arch Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ironclad Concepts, LLC. (Pallas, George)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ironclad Concepts, LLC.(Pallas, George)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pallas, George)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17645248)Document filed by Ironclad Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pallas, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America by and for the use of Ironclad Concepts, LLC v. Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironclad Concepts, LLC
Represented By: George E Pallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?