G__ P__ v. Speedway, LLC
Plaintiff: G_P_ an infant, by his Parent and Natural Guardian, Angel Padilla and G__ P__
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv08908
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Eli Mainetti on behalf of G__ P__. (Mainetti, Alexander)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 12/7/2019. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by 2/5/2020. Expert Deposition due by 4/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Discovery due by 5/6/2020. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is 1 and a half - 2 weeks. 16. By 2/14/20, counsel shall submit joint letter regarding settlement and whether case should be referred to mediation. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/6/2019) (mml)
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2019. Case management plan signed. A joint letter regarding settlement is due on or before 2-14-20. Further conference is scheduled for 5-20-20 at 9:30 a.m. (dh)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The 10/31/2019 conference is adjourned to 11/6/2019, at 9:30 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (vjm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 31, 2019 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jacqueline Bushwack dated October 23, 2019. Document filed by Speedway, LLC.(Bushwack, Jacqueline)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASEMANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16,on 10-31-19 at 11:00a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601. Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
September 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacqueline Mecchella Bushwack. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: G_P_ an infant, by his Parent and Natural Guardian, Angel Padilla. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway, LLC. Document filed by Speedway, LLC.(Bushwack, Jacqueline)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bushwack, Jacqueline)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF000515-2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17662611).Document filed by Speedway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C- Bill of Particulars, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Supplemental Demand)(Bushwack, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G__ P__ v. Speedway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Mecchella Bushwack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G_P_ an infant, by his Parent and Natural Guardian, Angel Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G__ P__
Represented By: Alexander Eli Mainetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?