Somnia, Inc. v. Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Somnia, Inc.
Defendant: PST Services, Inc. and Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv08983
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #19 Motion for Alexander G. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Alexander G. Gray, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/22/19) (yv)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 Motion for Luke Roniger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Luke Roniger, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/22/19) (yv)
November 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Luke Roniger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18122602. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #19 MOTION for Alexander G. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18122708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Alexander G. Gray to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18122708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc..(Gray, Alexander)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Luke Roniger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18122602. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc..(Roniger, Luke)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 MOTION for Timothy G. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Timothy G. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18087707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Timothy G. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18087707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc..(Barber, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference regarding Change Healthcare TES's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint. The Court will hold pre-motion conference on 1/7/20, at 11:00 SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/4/2019) (jca)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael J. Keane dated November 1, 2019 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference regarding Change Healthcare TES's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Paul A. Straus dated 10/29/2019. . Document filed by Somnia, Inc.. (Keane, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference regarding Change Healthcare TES's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Paul A. Straus dated 10/29/2019. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC.(Straus, Paul)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NONE for PST Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Change Healthcare Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate McKesson Corporation, Other Affiliate Change Healthcare Intermediate Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Change Healthcare, LLC, Other Affiliate Change Healthcare Inc. for Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carrie Ratliff)(Straus, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Jury Demand, Plaintiff's Rule 7.1, Notice of Appearance for M. Keane and Notice of Appearance for Jason Hsi served on Paul A. Straus on October 4, 2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Somnia, Inc.. (Hsi, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Somnia, Inc.(Hsi, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Somnia, Inc..(Hsi, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Yin-Zen Hsi on behalf of Somnia, Inc.. (Hsi, Jason)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Keane on behalf of Somnia, Inc.. (Keane, Michael)
October 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Paul A. Straus to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,. Granted. (Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC answer due 10/29/2019; PST Services, Inc. answer due 10/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/1/19) (yv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until October 29, 2019 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Paul Straus dated 9/30/2019. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc..(Straus, Paul)
September 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul A. Straus. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court). (dnh)
September 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul A. Straus. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal,, etc. served on Garfunkel & Wild P.C.., Counsel for Plaintiff on 9/26/2019. Service was made by US Mail and electronic mail. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc.. (Straus, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NONE for PST Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Change Healthcare Holdings, LLC for Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC. Document filed by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, PST Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Carrie Ratcliff)(Straus, Paul) Modified on 10/4/2019 (ldi).
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Straus, Paul)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 54087/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-17671384).Document filed by PST Services, Inc., Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Papers - Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit 1- State Court Papers - Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit 1- State Court Papers - Part 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Carrie Ratcliff)(Straus, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somnia, Inc. v. Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PST Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Straus
Represented By: Alexander Gray
Represented By: Luke Roniger
Represented By: Timothy Gillam Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Straus
Represented By: Alexander Gray
Represented By: Luke Roniger
Represented By: Timothy Gillam Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somnia, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Keane
Represented By: Jason Yin-Zen Hsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?