United States of America v. LaSala, Sr.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kenneth LaSala, Sr.
Case Number: 7:2019cv09196
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6672
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart A. Smith on behalf of Kenneth LaSala, Sr.. (Smith, Stuart)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Kenneth LaSala, Sr..(Smith, Stuart)
October 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kenneth LaSala, Sr. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Document filed by United States of America. (Sun, Anthony)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth LaSala, Sr.. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth LaSala, Sr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Sun, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sun, Anthony)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth LaSala, Sr.. Document filed by United States of America.(Sun, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. LaSala, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth LaSala, Sr.
Represented By: Stuart A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?