Rosendale v. Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald P. Rosendale
Defendant: Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv09263
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Mr. Cooper Group Inc. on 11/1/19. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Donald P. Rosendale. (sbr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint against Mr. Cooper Group Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Donald P. Rosendale. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sbr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oxana Lukina on behalf of Mr. Cooper Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Request for a Pre-Motion Conference, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lukina, Oxana)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons served on Mr. Cooper Group, Inc. on 10/11/2019. Service was accepted by Candice Westbrook. Document filed by Donald P. Rosendale. (sbr)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mr. Cooper Group Inc.. (rdz)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Donald P. Rosendale.(rdz)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mr. Cooper Group Inc.. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465407017495)Document filed by Donald P. Rosendale.(rdz)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosendale v. Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper Group Inc.
Represented By: Oxana Lukina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald P. Rosendale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?