Lee v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nancy Lee
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 7:2019cv09451
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Judith C McCarthy
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from AUSA Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher dated 11-18-19 re: non-consent to the magistratre judge for all purposes. Document filed by Andrew Saul.(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul. (pne)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By Order dated October 16, 2019, the Court referred this case to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy for a Report and Recommendation. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, defendant's counsel shall file a letter by no later than November 18, 2019 advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/16/2019) (mml)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/16/2019) (mml)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne)
October 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Nancy Lee.(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nancy Lee. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Nancy Lee.(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lee
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?