Ruiz v. Chubb National Insurance Company et al.
Plaintiff: Sandra Ruiz
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company and Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Case Number: 7:2019cv09518
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the parties to complete my Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be submitted to chambers by December 16, 2019. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge Smith within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/10/2019) (rj)
December 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The initial status conference is hereby rescheduled for December 13, 2019 at 10:45 a.m. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 10:45 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/2/2019) (mro)
November 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so redesignated. (wb)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Letter with scheduling order. Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. (Mehary, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Affidavit of Service as to Orders served. Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. (Mehary, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The initial status conference is hereby adjourned to November 22, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties shall submit the joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's October 18, 2019 Order by November 15, 2019. (Initial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/12/2019) (jwh)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/18/2019) (jca)
October 16, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Sandra Ruiz, Chubb Group of Insurance Companies added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Mehary, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael G. Mehary. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael G. Mehary re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add Chubb Group of Insurance Companies to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael G. Mehary. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sandra Ruiz, Chubb National Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mehary, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company.(Mehary, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Chubb National Insurance Company. Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company.(Mehary, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 29679/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17775333).Document filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Compliant)(Mehary, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Chubb National Insurance Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael G. Mehary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?