Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration v. Gouin et al
Plaintiff: Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration
Defendant: Yvetot G. Gouin, Linda Gouin, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Solarium Editorial, Inc., John Doe #1-5, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Linda Jean Petros, Yvetot Gouin and Virginia K. Williams
Case Number: 7:2019cv09931
Filed: October 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345df
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Linda Gouin served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Gouin aka Linda Jean Petros. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Virginia K. Williams served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Virginia K. Williams. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ameriquest Mortgage Company served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky authorized by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky authorized by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Service was accepted by Devika Etwaroo. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Solarium Editorial, Inc. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky authorized by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Linda Gouin, Yvetot G. Gouin, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Solarium Editorial, Inc., Virginia K. Williams. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linda Gouin a/k/a Linda Jean Petros; Yvetot G. Gouin aka Yvetot Gouin; Virginia K. Williams; Solarium Editorial, Inc.; Ameriquest Mortgage Company; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Mortgage Master, Inc.; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John)
October 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Manfredi to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct official A.O. Summons form dated (rev. 6/12). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linda Gouin a/k/a Linda Jean Petros; Yvetot G. Gouin aka Yvetot Gouin; Virginia K. Williams; Solarium Editorial, Inc.; Ameriquest Mortgage Company; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Mortgage Master, Inc.; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. (Manfredi, John) Modified on 10/30/2019 (dnh).
October 29, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Linda Gouin, Yvetot G. Gouin, John Doe #1-5, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Solarium Editorial, Inc., Virginia K. Williams added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Manfredi, John)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Manfredi to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the summons request were not added to CM/ECF; request the issuance of summons after adding the omitted parties to the docket. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Manfredi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Dollar Demand left blank; County code Rockland; Fee Status code pd (paid). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $117,000; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to none (no fee required). (dnh)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Manfredi re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties 'Virginia K. Williams' and 'Jane Doe #1-5' with corresponding party text. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Manfredi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Mortgage Master, Inc., Solarium Editorial, Inc.;, Yvetot G. Gouin, Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration, an Agency of the Government of the United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 26, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linda Gouin a/k/a Linda Jean Petros; Yvetot G. Gouin aka Yvetot Gouin; Virginia K. Williams; Solarium Editorial, Inc.; Ameriquest Mortgage Company; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Mortgage Master, Inc.; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration, an Agency of the Government of the United States of America. (Manfredi, John) Modified on 10/28/2019 (dnh).
October 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Manfredi, John)
October 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Solarium Editorial, Inc.;, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Linda Gouin, Yvetot G. Gouin, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5,, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Mortgage Master, Inc., New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. Document filed by Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration, an Agency of the Government of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit a, #2 Exhibit exhibit b, #3 Exhibit exhibit c, #4 Exhibit exhibit d, #5 Exhibit exhibit e, #6 Exhibit exhibit f)(Manfredi, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration v. Gouin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvetot G. Gouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Gouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solarium Editorial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Jean Petros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvetot Gouin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia K. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?