United Jewish Appeal-Federation of Jewish Philanthropies of New York, Inc. v. 1/0 Technology Corp. et al
Plaintiff: United Jewish Appeal-Federation of Jewish Philanthropies of New York, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Williams and 1/0 Technology Corp.
Case Number: 7:2019cv10082
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 USBC Case Number 19-8298 (rdd). (gp)
October 31, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York. (pne)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-23909(RDD). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (pne)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1/0 Technology Corp..(Cvek, Julie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cvek, Julie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652076/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17863124).Document filed by 1/0 Technology Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons + Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amended Answer 1/0 Technology Corp., #5 Exhibit 5 - Amended Answer Paul Williams, #6 Exhibit 6 - Reply to Counterclaim)(Cvek, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Jewish Appeal-Federation of Jewish Philanthropies of New York, Inc. v. 1/0 Technology Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1/0 Technology Corp.
Represented By: Julie Anna Cvek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Jewish Appeal-Federation of Jewish Philanthropies of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?