Silvestri v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eve Silvestri
Defendant: Kohl's Middletown, Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Kohl's Department Store
Case Number: 7:2019cv10550
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Solomon Rosenrauch on behalf of Eve Silvestri. (Rosenrauch, Sheila)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of ORANGE. Case Number: EF012140-2018..Document filed by Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit DEFENDANT'S ANSWER, #3 Exhibit DEFENDANT'S CPLR 3017 DEMAND, #4 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S BILL OF PARTICULARS, #5 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENANT'S CPLR 3017 DEMAND)(Harris, Todd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of ORANGE. Case Number: EF012140-2018..Document filed by Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Harris, Todd)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Todd Russell Harris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); County code Orange; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Todd Russell Harris to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al'; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Todd Russell Harris to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be separated and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-18059107, paid on 11/14/2019. (jgo)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of ORANGE. Case Number: EF12140-2018..Document filed by Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, #2 Exhibit Exhibits C-E)(Harris, Todd) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jgo).
November 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Todd Russell Harris to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/20/2019. (jgo)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kohl's Illinois, Inc..(Harris, Todd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Harris, Todd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Harris, Todd) Modified on 11/18/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvestri v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Silvestri
Represented By: Sheila Solomon Rosenrauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Middletown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Russell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Russell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?