U.S. Bank National Association v. Morgano et al
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: SARAH MORGANO and PETER MORGANO
Case Number: 7:2019cv10729
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Accordingly, provided that defendants remain in default, plaintiff is ORDERED to seek certificates of default as to defendants by January 28, 2020, and thereafter to move, by order to show cause, for default judgment against defendants by February 11, 2020. If plaintiff fails to satisfy either deadline, the Court may dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute or failure to comply with court orders. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41{b). SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 2/11/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/14/2020) (mml)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sarah Morgano served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. Service was accepted by Sarah Morgano, self. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Peter Morgano served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Peter Morgano, self. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Southern District of New York. Other Court Case Number: 19-cv-10729. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Morgano, Sarah Morgano. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
November 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas John Bebirian. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PETER MORGANO, SARAH MORGANO, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (dnh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY. Document filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SARAH MORGANO; PETER MORGANO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PETER MORGANO, SARAH MORGANO. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18102672)Document filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Morgano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH MORGANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER MORGANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?