Munn v. APF Management Company, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Molly Munn
Defendant: JOHN 1-10 DOES, Joseph Klausner, Selznick & Co. LLP, Gregory J. Petrillo, Carl E. Petrillo, APF Management Company, LLC., Matthew J. Petrillo and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 7:2019cv10791
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER re: Waiver of the Service of Summons. Document filed by Molly Munn.(Eyet, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant Selznick & Co. LLP and Joseph Klausner may have until 2/18/20 to respond to the Amended Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Robert J. Bergson dated 1/16/2020. Document filed by Joseph Klausner, Selznick & Co. LLP.(Bergson, Robert)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Joseph Bergson on behalf of Joseph Klausner, Selznick & Co. LLP. (Bergson, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Joseph Klausner served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. Service was accepted by Jill Savino, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Selznick & Co. LLP served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. Service was accepted by Jill Savino, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint,, #11 Amended Complaint, against APF Management Company, LLC., John Does 1-10, Joseph Klausner, Carl E. Petrillo, Gregory J. Petrillo, Matthew J. Petrillo, Selznick & Co. LLP.Document filed by Molly Munn. Related document: #4 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint,, #11 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - BK Agreement)(Eyet, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Travis Eyet to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type being used (AMENDED COMPLAINT). Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint against APF Management Company, LLC., John Does 1-10, Joseph Klausner, Carl E. Petrillo, Gregory J. Petrillo, Matthew J. Petrillo, Selznick & Co. LLP.Document filed by Molly Munn. Related document: #4 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - BK Settlement)(Eyet, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2019 (sj).
December 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Travis Eyet to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type being used; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, against All Defendants.Document filed by Molly Munn. Related document: #4 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit BK Agreement)(Eyet, Matthew) Modified on 12/19/2019 (jgo).
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Selznick & Co. LLP. (pne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Klausner. (pne)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Selznick & Co. LLP, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Klausner, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Travis Eyet to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption error, caption must match exactly as pleading; if all parties do not fit in caption, list leading defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
November 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Travis Eyet. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 26:7428; Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
November 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Klausner, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew) Modified on 11/25/2019 (sj).
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Selznick & Co. LLP, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew) Modified on 11/25/2019 (sj).
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against APF Management Company, LLC., JOHN 1-10 DOES, Joseph Klausner, Carl E. Petrillo, Gregory J. Petrillo, Matthew J. Petrillo, Selznick & Co. LLP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18128296)Document filed by Molly Munn.(Eyet, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Travis Eyet to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/27/2019. (sj)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eyet, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Selznick & Co. LLP, re: Complaint. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Klausner, re: Complaint. Document filed by Molly Munn. (Eyet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munn v. APF Management Company, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN 1-10 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Klausner
Represented By: Robert Joseph Bergson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selznick & Co. LLP
Represented By: Robert Joseph Bergson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl E. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APF Management Company, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Munn
Represented By: Matthew Travis Eyet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?