Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc. et al v. State Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Stepping Stones Associates, L.P., Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P., Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc., Shub Karman, Inc., DiLaRe, Inc., Apartment Owners Advisory Council, Jefferson House Associates, L.P., Nilsen Management Co., Inc., Property Management Associates, Cooperative and Condominium Council and Lisa DeRosa
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas, in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal, State Of New York, Division of Homes and Community Renewal and Ruthanne Visnauskas
Case Number: 7:2019cv11285
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS . Document filed by Apartment Owners Advisory Council, Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc., Cooperative and Condominium Council, Lisa DeRosa, DiLaRe, Inc., Jefferson House Associates, L.P., Nilsen Management Co., Inc., Property Management Associates, Shub Karman, Inc., Stepping Stones Associates, L.P...(Finger, Kenneth)
February 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Division of Homes and Community Renewal answer due 3/6/2020; State Of New York answer due 3/6/2020; Ruthanne Visnauskas answer due 3/6/2020. (jca)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Serve Pre-Motion Letter. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/4/2020) (jca)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Serve Pre-Motion Letter addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael A. Berg dated 2/4/20. Document filed by Division of Homes and Community Renewal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Adam Berg on behalf of Division of Homes and Community Renewal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas..(Berg, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ruthanne Visnauskas waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Jefferson House Associates, L.P.; Cooperative and Condominium Council; Shub Karman, Inc.; Property Management Associates; Apartment Owners Advisory Council; DiLaRe, Inc.; Stepping Stones Associates, L.P.; Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc.; Nilsen Management Co., Inc.; Lisa DeRosa..(Finger, Kenneth)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Division of Homes and Community Renewal waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Jefferson House Associates, L.P.; Cooperative and Condominium Council; Shub Karman, Inc.; Property Management Associates; Apartment Owners Advisory Council; DiLaRe, Inc.; Stepping Stones Associates, L.P.; Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc.; Nilsen Management Co., Inc.; Lisa DeRosa..(Finger, Kenneth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. State Of New York waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Jefferson House Associates, L.P.; Cooperative and Condominium Council; Shub Karman, Inc.; Property Management Associates; Apartment Owners Advisory Council; DiLaRe, Inc.; Stepping Stones Associates, L.P.; Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc.; Nilsen Management Co., Inc.; Lisa DeRosa. (Finger, Kenneth)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Division of Homes and Community Renewal, State Of New York, Ruthanne Visnauskas. (pc)
December 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Joel Finger to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
December 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Joel Finger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P., RuthAnne Visnauskas, in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Apartment Owners Advisory Council, Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc., Cooperative and Condominium Council, DiLaRe, Inc., Jefferson House Associates, L.P., Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P., Nilsen Management Co., Inc., Property Management Associates, Shub Karman, Inc., Stepping Stones Associates, L.P..(Finger, Kenneth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Finger, Kenneth) Modified on 12/11/2019 (pc).
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, RuthAnne Visnauskas in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal, Division of Homes and Community Renewal, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Apartment Owners Advisory Council, Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc., Cooperative and Condominium Council, DiLaRe, Inc., Jefferson House Associates, L.P., Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P., Nilsen Management Co., Inc., Property Management Associates, Shub Karman, Inc., Stepping Stones Associates, L.P.. (Finger, Kenneth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Division of Homes and Community Renewal, RuthAnne Visnauskas, in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal, State Of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18250466)Document filed by Jefferson House Associates, L.P., Cooperative and Condominium Council, Shub Karman, Inc., Property Management Associates, Apartment Owners Advisory Council, DiLaRe, Inc., Stepping Stones Associates, L.P., Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc., Nilsen Management Co., Inc., Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P..(Finger, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc. et al v. State Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stepping Stones Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa DeRosa as Principal of Stepping Stones, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building and Realty Institute of Westchester and Putnam Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shub Karman, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiLaRe, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Owners Advisory Council
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson House Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilsen Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property Management Associates
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooperative and Condominium Council
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa DeRosa
Represented By: Kenneth Joel Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RuthAnne Visnauskas, in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of New York
Represented By: Michael Adam Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Homes and Community Renewal
Represented By: Michael Adam Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruthanne Visnauskas
Represented By: Michael Adam Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?