Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC v. Sensory Path Inc.
Plaintiff: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC
Defendant: Sensory Path Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv11697
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sensory Path Inc. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celeste M. Butera on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celeste M. Butera on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste)
December 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Celeste M. Butera. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Putnam. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sensory Path Inc.. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sensory Path Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Celeste M. Butera re: that this action be filed as related to 3:19-cv-219-GHD-RP. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC.(Butera, Celeste)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC.(Butera, Celeste)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Butera, Celeste)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sensory Path Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18334355)Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Butera, Celeste)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC v. Sensory Path Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensory Path Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC
Represented By: Celeste M. Butera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?