Ji v. Aily Foot Relax Station Inc et al
Plaintiff: Yong Biao Ji
Defendant: Xiang Man Zhang, Ke Xue Zheng, Ailing Zhang, Linda Foot Relax Spa Station Inc and Aily Foot Relax Station Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv11881
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . Document filed by Aily Foot Relax Station Inc. Responses due by 2/28/2020 Return Date set for 3/13/2020 at 09:30 AM..(Ye, Ning)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 4/20/20 at 9:30 a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES, IN WRITING, OF THE CONFERENCE DATE AND TIME, AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER (UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES). Initial Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (jca)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ning Ye on behalf of Aily Foot Relax Station Inc. (Ye, Ning)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aily Foot Relax Station Inc, Linda Foot Relax Spa Station Inc, Xiang Man Zhang, Ke Xue Zheng. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aily Foot Relax Station Inc; Linda Foot Relax Spa Station Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (jgo)
December 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Yong Biao Ji. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 29, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Yong Biao Ji.(Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AILY FOOT RELAX STATION INC d/b/a Foot Relax Spa Station; and LINDA FOOT RELAX SPA STATION d/b/a Foot Relax Spa Station; XIANG MAN ZHANG a/k/a Ailing Zhang, and KE XUE ZHENG, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Yong Biao Ji. (Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aily Foot Relax Station Inc, Linda Foot Relax Spa Station Inc, Xiang Man Zhang, Ke Xue Zheng. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18380404)Document filed by Yong Biao Ji. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ji v. Aily Foot Relax Station Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiang Man Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ke Xue Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ailing Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Foot Relax Spa Station Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aily Foot Relax Station Inc
Represented By: Ning Ye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Biao Ji
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?