Pfeiffer v. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Margaret Pfeiffer
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 7:2019cv11897
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Paul M. Hoffman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18928164. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF FLORIDA; SUPREME COURT STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS; AFFIDAVIT;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Paul M. Hoffman, Esq.'s Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing re: #13 MOTION for Paul M. Hoffman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18928164. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer..(Hoffman, Paul)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul M. Hoffman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18928164. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Hoffman, Paul) Modified on 2/26/2020 (vba).
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Rovner on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II..(Rovner, Allison)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Alex M. Azar, II served on 1/15/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Special Agent Brusso, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer. (Miele, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex M. Azar, II. (jgo)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health & Human Services, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer. (Miele, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Miele, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer.(Miele, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Miele on behalf of Margaret Pfeiffer. (Miele, Robert)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kelly Marie Naughton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $17,429,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $17,000. (pne)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kelly Marie Naughton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Margaret Pfeiffer, Alex M. Azar, II. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kelly Marie Naughton to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff's attorney information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kelly Marie Naughton to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type COMPLAINT found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kelly Marie Naughton to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. (pne)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Naughton, Kelly) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Alex M. Azar, II.Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Naughton, Kelly) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary United States Department of Health & Human Services, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer. (Naughton, Kelly) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Naughton, Kelly) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18386786)Document filed by Margaret Pfeiffer.(Naughton, Kelly) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeiffer v. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Pfeiffer
Represented By: Kelly Marie Naughton
Represented By: Paul M Hoffman
Represented By: Robert Michael Miele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?