Ruiz v. Link et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ruiz
Defendant: P. Link, John Doe #4, John Doe #1, Patrick Squire, John Doe #3, John Doe #2, Deborah MacDonald and J. Reyes
Case Number: 7:2020cv00235
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to The Superintendent Elmira Correctional Facility 1879 Davis St P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14901-0500..(vba)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Michael Ruiz DIN No. 15B0450 Elmira Correctional Facility 1879 Davis St P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14901-0500, at, on 2/18/2020 Re: #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/18/2020 Re: Judge Cathy Seibel #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) P. Link, Deborah MacDonald, J. Reyes, Patrick Squire. (nb)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to P. Link, Deborah MacDonald, J. Reyes, Patrick Squire..(nb)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue summonses. complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Correction Officers P. Link, J. Reyes, and Patrick Squire; and Registered Nurse Deborah MacDonald and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to New York State Attorney General at: 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York 10005. The Court ce1tifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/14/2020) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiffs obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/6/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to Michael Ruiz DIN No. 15B0450 Elmira Correctional Facility 1879 Davis St P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14901-0500. (nb)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Michael Ruiz..(sc)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Michael Ruiz..(sc)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an AMENDED IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 2/12/2020. AMENDED In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/12/2020. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 2/12/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/13/2020) (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP Application, #2 Prisoner Authorization)(dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Michael Ruiz DIN No. 15B0450 Elmira Correctional Facility 1879 Davis St P.O. Box 500 Elmira, NY 14901-0500. (aea)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Michael Ruiz. (sac)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, P. Link, Deborah MacDonald, J. Reyes, Patrick Squire. Document filed by Michael Ruiz. (sac)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michael Ruiz. (sac)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Link et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?