In Re: The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.
Appellant: Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Bottling Group, LLC, Pepsi USA, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc. and Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC
Appellee: The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00583
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Pepsi USA, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc...(Chubak, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc...(Crapo, David)
February 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 2/28/2020. (mml)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/7/2020) (mml)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Joseph D. Frank dated February 5, 2020. Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc...(Frank, Joseph)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PepsiCo, Inc. for Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc.. Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Pepsi USA, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc...(Chubak, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/14/2020 (jca)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appeal. OK. Motion will be granted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/23/2020) (jca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from David N. Crapo dated 01/23/2020 re: In re The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., et al.. Document filed by The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc..(Crapo, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Joseph D. Frank in Support re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Pepsi USA, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(bkar)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Pepsi USA, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc. (bkar)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ, Pepsi USA, PepsiCo, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc..(bkar)
January 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Robert D. Drain dated January 2, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-8245A, 15-B-23007 (RDD). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Bottling Group, LLC, Frito-Lay North America, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Pepsi USA, Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC, Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc., Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc., Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pepsi Bottling Group, NJ
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Quaker Sales and Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bottling Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pepsi USA
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stacy's Pita Chip Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Muller Quaker Dairy, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Chubak
Represented By: Joseph D. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.
Represented By: David N. Crapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?