Schneider et al v. Mahopac Central School District et al
Plaintiff: Isabella Schneider, Karly L. Schneider, Jonathan Schneider and Jackson H. Schneider
Defendant: Ray McDonough, Leslie Mancuso, Dr. Greg Stowell, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Lucy Massafra, David Furfaro, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Anthony DiCarlo, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Simone and Lawrence Keene
Case Number: 7:2020cv00709
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Conference: Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 12:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' letter by 4/21/20. This will be a phone conference; see my emergency rules on the Court's website for more information. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference re Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Lewis Silverman dated March 20, 2020. Document filed by Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE of Complaint and Additional Items, 19 page letter dated 12/14/19 served on Mahopac Central School on 1/29/20. Service was accepted by Denise Ryan-School Secretary. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sbr)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis R. Silverman on behalf of Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell..(Silverman, Lewis)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Leon Banks on behalf of Mahopac Central School District..(Banks, Steven)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants may have until 3/20/20 to respond to the Complaint. Mr. Banks should file a notice of appearance for the District forthwith. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Steven L. Banks dated February 13, 2020. Document filed by Mahopac Central School District..(Banks, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 Original Signature Page. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sbr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jonathan Schneider dated 2/5/20 re: thank you for your time regarding this communication. It is being written in hopes to communicate my family's predicament to you regarding the above referenced case. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider.(sbr)
January 31, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, #6 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, to Jonathan Schneider 24 Jackson Road Mahopac, NY 10541. (aea)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff Jonathan Schneider is the only Plaintiff in this case. The Court dismisses without prejudice the claims of the other Plaintiffs named in the caption of the complaint. Because the civil cover sheet, complaint, and supporting documentation reveal the full name of Plaintiffs minor child, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to limit electronic access to these documents (ECF Nos. 1, 1-1, 2) to a "case-participant only" basis. Plaintiff must comply with Rule 5.2(a)(3) when submitting any documents in the future. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Isabella Schneider and Jackson H. Schneider terminated.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/30/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 2/3/2020 (rro).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to resubmit the signature page of the complaint with an original signature to the Court within thirty days of the date of this order. A copy of the signature page is attached to this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed.The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 19l5(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in form a pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/30/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jonathan M. Schneider consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jonathan Schneider. (sac)
January 27, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony DiCarlo, David Furfaro, Lawrence Keene, Mahopac Central School District, Leslie Mancuso, Lucy Massafra, Ray McDonough, Michael Mongon, Marc O'Connor, Ben Pallant, Adam Savino, Michael Simone, Greg Stowell. (sac)
January 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
January 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider et al v. Mahopac Central School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karly L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson H. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonough
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Mancuso
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Greg Stowell
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Pallant
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Savino
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Massafra
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Furfaro
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mongon
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc O'Connor
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DiCarlo
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahopac Central School District
Represented By: Steven Leon Banks
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Simone
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Keene
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?