Kemp v. Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kemp and Denise Kemp
Defendant: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv02270
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Bergstein on behalf of Denise Kemp..(Bergstein, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court waives the Initial Pre-trial Conference and directs the parties to complete a Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto). Said Scheduling Order shall be submitted to chambers by April 23, 2020. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge McCarthy within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/24/2020) (rj)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Sarah Goddard on behalf of Denise Kemp..(Goddard, Megan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Clark, Shawn)
March 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 16, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Notice of Appearance, and #5 Notice of Appearance served on Megan S. Goddard and Steve Bergstein on March 13, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Clark, Shawn)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Matthew Clark on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Clark, Shawn)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Robert Benson on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Benson, Craig)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Sanofi for Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Benson, Craig)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benson, Craig)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68499/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19107963).Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit B: Demand for Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Stipulation, #4 Exhibit D: Complaint, #5 Exhibit E: Notice to Clerk of Supreme Court, #6 Exhibit F: Notice to Adverse Party).(Benson, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Kemp
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Represented By: Stephen Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Matthew Clark
Represented By: Craig Robert Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?