Twin City Fire Insurance Company v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz and Hoan Ton-That
Case Number: 7:2020cv02570
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hoan Ton-That..(pc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hoan Ton-That, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clearview AI, Inc...(pne)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Schwartz..(pne)
March 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katherine E. Tammaro to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant name contains a typographical error on docket entry and in 'To' section of the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST 'As To' PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hon Ton-That, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine) Modified on 3/30/2020 (pne).
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Schwartz, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc., re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katherine E. Tammaro to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Use the standard AO 440 summons form not the FIOA summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Schwartz, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine) Modified on 3/27/2020 (pc).
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine) Modified on 3/27/2020 (pc).
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Clearview AI, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine) Modified on 3/27/2020 (pc).
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That. Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit G 2 of 2).(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 26, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
March 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Katherine E. Tammaro. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
March 26, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
March 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katherine E. Tammaro. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ton-That Hoan was modified to Hoan Ton-That; Schwartz Richard was modified to Richard Schwartz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
March 26, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Katherine E. Tammaro to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney (Katherine E. Tammaro). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine E. Tammaro on behalf of Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine E. Tammaro on behalf of Twin City Fire Insurance Company..(Tammaro, Katherine)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Clearview AI, Inc., Ton-That Hoan, Schwartz Richard. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19230038)Document filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G-1, #8 Exhibit G-2).(Tammaro, Katherine) Modified on 3/26/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin City Fire Insurance Company v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine E. Tammaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?