Sullivan v. KeyBank N.A.
Plaintiff: Robert Sullivan
Defendant: KeyBank N.A.
Case Number: 7:2020cv02762
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Philip L. Fraietta dated June 16, 2020 re: #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference in Anticipation of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Erica Barrow dated June 11, 2020. . Document filed by Robert Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Fraietta, Philip)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference in Anticipation of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Erica Barrow dated June 11, 2020. Document filed by KeyBank N.A...(Barrow, Erica)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for KeyBank N.A.. Document filed by KeyBank N.A...(Barrow, Erica)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint.The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminated the motion (doc. 6). KeyBank N.A. answer due 6/11/2020. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/20/2020) (rj)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Erica Barrow dated April 20, 2020. Document filed by KeyBank N.A...(Barrow, Erica)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Sullivan served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Service was accepted by Deanne Schauseil, Registered Agent. Document filed by Robert Sullivan..(Fraietta, Philip)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KeyBank N.A...(pc)
April 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KeyBank N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Sullivan..(Fraietta, Philip)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fraietta, Philip)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KeyBank N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19315747)Document filed by Robert Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. KeyBank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sullivan
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank N.A.
Represented By: Erica Adina Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?