Village of Bronxville v. Pam Transportation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Village of Bronxville
Defendant: PAM TRANSPORTATION INC. and CARL WILLIAM-CYRIL McCLEAN
Case Number: 7:2020cv02936
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Carl William-Cyril McClean, Pam Transportation Inc...(Backis, Thomas)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Thomas V. Backis dated June 8, 2020 re: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Document filed by Carl William-Cyril McClean, Pam Transportation Inc...(Backis, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia W Gurahian on behalf of Village of Bronxville..(Gurahian, Patricia)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund C Grainger, III on behalf of Village of Bronxville..(Grainger, Edmund)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Carl William-Cyril McClean, Pam Transportation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Backis, Thomas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern by telephone conference. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831.(ks)
April 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Vincent Backis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PAM TRANSPORTATION INC., CARL WILLIAM-CYRIL McCLEAN. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent P.A.M. Transportation Services, Inc. for PAM TRANSPORTATION INC.. Document filed by PAM TRANSPORTATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Backis, Thomas)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Backis, Thomas)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 53140/20. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19394815).Document filed by CARL WILLIAM-CYRIL McCLEAN, PAM TRANSPORTATION INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit McClean Service, #3 Exhibit email, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Service).(Backis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village of Bronxville v. Pam Transportation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM TRANSPORTATION INC.
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Backis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL WILLIAM-CYRIL McCLEAN
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Backis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Bronxville
Represented By: Edmund C Grainger, III
Represented By: Patricia W Gurahian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?