June 8, 2023 |
Filing
163
ORDER granting 162 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The parties shall file their Cheeks submission, including the settlement agreement, joint letter, and proposed order, by June 8, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 162. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/8/2023) (jca)
|
May 24, 2023 |
Filing
161
ORDER granting 160 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The parties shall file their Cheeks submission, including the settlement agreement, joint letter, and proposed order, by June 7, 2023. No further extensions will be granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 160. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 5/23/2023) (ate)
|
March 28, 2023 |
Filing
155
ORDER granting 154 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The parties shall submit proposed Jury Instructions in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices by March 31, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 154. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/28/2023) (vfr)
|
March 20, 2023 |
Filing
150
ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/20/2023) (ks)
|
March 17, 2023 |
Filing
149
ORDER denying 146 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Trial Ready Date; granting 146 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Jury Charge, Verdict Form, and Voir Dire. Application granted only to the extent the parties see k additional time to file a proposed jury charge, proposed verdict sheet, and proposed voir dire. That deadline is extended to March 27, 2023. Plaintiff's additional requests are denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 146. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/16/2023) (jca)
|
October 31, 2022 |
Filing
140
ORDER Defendants shall make available for deposition Defendants Kai Zhang Yao, Ru Yan Yao, and "John" Yao, selecting dates therefor with Plaintiff's counsel this week. Plaintiff shall be deposed at Defendants' counsel's o ffice on December 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The Court further directed the parties to meet and confer to coordinate the exchange of documents and scheduling of depositions. No further extensions to complete discovery will be granted beyond December 19, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/31/2022) (jca)
|
September 28, 2021 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal 56 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. For the foregoing reasons, the motions for a default judgment and for attorneys' fees and costs are DENIED without prejudice to renew within thirty days. P laintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on each Defendant and file proof of service on the docket by October 3, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate sequence pending at Doc. 56. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/28/2021) (jca)
|
February 24, 2021 |
Filing
67
ORDER: On February 22, 2021, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause in connection with Plaintiff's application for a default judgment against Defendants. (Doc. 59). That Order to Show Cause set the following schedule: (1) Defendants' opposition papers must be filed and served by March 19, 2021; and (2) Plaintiff's reply papers must be filed and served by March 26, 2021. (Id.). On February 19, 2021, Plaintiff filed a motion for attorneys' fees and costs. (See Docs. 5 6-58). The briefing schedule associated with Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees will mirror the schedule associated with the Order to Show Cause. Specifically: (1) Defendants' opposition papers to Plaintiff's motion for att orneys' fees must be filed and served by March 19, 2021; and (2) Plaintiff's reply papers must be filed and served by March 26, 2021. Plaintiff is directed to serve this Order on each Defendant and file proof of service on the docket by 5:00 p.m. on February 26, 2021. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/24/2021) ( Responses due by 3/19/2021, Replies due by 3/26/2021.) (ks)
|
January 19, 2021 |
Filing
47
ORDER re: 41 Clerk's Certificate of Default, 45 Clerk's Certificate of Default, 42 Clerk's Certificate of Default, 40 Clerk's Certificate of Default, 43 Clerk's Certificate of Default, 46 Clerk's Cert ificate of Default, 44 Clerk's Certificate of Default. Accordingly, the Court directs that by February 12, 2021, Plaintiff shall either: (1) seek a default judgment in accordance with this Court's Individual Practices; or (2) voluntaril y discontinue this action. In the event that Plaintiff fails to take either action, this proceeding will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/19/2021) (kv)
|
October 19, 2020 |
Filing
21
ORDER: Accordingly, the parties are directed to submit a joint letter to the Court via ECF concerning the status of this action by October 30, 2020. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 10/19/2020) (cf)
|