Dingman et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Susan Dingman and Keith Dingman
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 7:2020cv04519
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:17-cv-6404. (sjo)
June 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Middle; Case Number: 3:20-cv-00589. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER with directions to the Clerk to open civil cases. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on June 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (originally filed in case 3:20-mc-8-J-32) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT regarding venue and division (originally filed in case 3:20-mc-8-J-32) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than May 18, 2020. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in this miscellaneous case as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on April 20, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Orders on Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Doc 9775, #2 Doc 9861, #3 Doc 9881, #4 Doc 10075, #5 Doc 10235, #6 Doc 10258, #7 Doc 10382, #8 Doc 10489, #9 Doc 10819, #10 Doc 10920, #11 Doc 10947, #12 Doc 11041, #13 Doc 11082, #14 Doc 11256, #15 Doc 12507, #16 Doc 12533, #17 Doc 17285, #18 Doc 17401) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Orders on Discovery and Privilege (Attachments: #1 Doc 314, #2 Doc 699, #3 Doc 2813, #4 Doc 4865, #5 Doc 6799, #6 Doc 8113, #7 Doc 8315) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Orders on Deposition Designation (Attachments: #1 Doc 10348, #2 Doc 10403, #3 Doc 10438, #4 Doc 10486, #5 Doc 10497, #6 Doc 10524, #7 Doc 10922, #8 Doc 11064, #9 Doc 11073, #10 Doc 11080, #11 Doc 11313, #12 Doc 12357, #13 Doc 12508, #14 Doc 12590, #15 Doc 12595, #16 Doc 12598, #17 Doc 17386, #18 Doc 17513, #19 Doc 17582) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Miscellaneous Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc 269, #2 Doc 8872, #3 Doc 8874, #4 Doc 10404, #5 Doc 10587, #6 Doc 11321, #7 Doc 11659, #8 Doc 11871, #9 Doc 12007, #10 Doc 12061, #11 Doc 12202, #12 Doc 12589, #13 Doc 12593, #14 Doc 12853, #15 Doc 12971, #16 Doc 17008, #17 Doc 18038) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Master and Short Form Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Doc 249, #2 Doc 303-2, #3 Doc 363, #4 Doc 364, #5 Doc 365, #6 Doc 366, #7 Doc 927, #8 Doc 1108, #9 Doc 1153-1, #10 Doc 1153-2, #11 Doc 1485) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Discovery Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc 249, #2 Doc 519, #3 Doc 1259, #4 Doc 1319, #5 Doc 1663, #6 Doc 2238, #7 Doc 2239, #8 Doc 3214, #9 Doc 3272, #10 Doc 3312, #11 Doc 3313, #12 Doc 3314, #13 Doc 3372, #14 Doc 3398, #15 Doc 3685, #16 Doc 4015, #17 Doc 4311, #18 Doc 4335, #19 Doc 4339, #20 Doc 4865, #21 Doc 4866, #22 Doc 5770, #23 Doc 5881, #24 Doc 5883, #25 Doc 6227, #26 Doc 6799) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Daubert Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc 9428, #2 Doc 9432, #3 Doc 9433, #4 Doc 9434, #5 Doc 9770, #6 Doc 9771, #7 Doc 9772, #8 Doc 9773, #9 Doc 9991, #10 Doc 10051, #11 Doc 10052, #12 Doc 10072, #13 Doc 10230, #14 Doc 10231, #15 Doc 16992, #16 Doc 17285) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Case Management Orders (Attachments: #1 Doc 248, #2 Doc 249, #3 Doc 314, #4 Doc 363, #5 Doc 365, #6 Doc 372, #7 Doc 401, #8 Doc 519, #9 Doc 927, #10 Doc 1108, #11 Doc 1259, #12 Doc 1319, #13 Doc 1485, #14 Doc 1662, #15 Doc 1663, #16 Doc 2238, #17 Doc 2239, #18 Doc 3214, #19 Doc 3215, #20 Doc 3372, #21 Doc 3685, #22 Doc 4015, #23 Doc 4016, #24 Doc 4141, #25 Doc 4311, #26 Doc 4335, #27 Doc 4866, #28 Doc 5007, #29 Doc 5285, #30 Doc 5770, #31 Doc 5881, #32 Doc 5883, #33 Doc 6227, #34 Doc 6799, #35 Doc 8113, #36 Doc 8871, #37 Doc 9415, #38 Doc 9775, #39 Doc 10323, #40 Doc 11011, #41 Doc 11320, #42 Doc 11659, #43 Doc 11871, #44 Doc 12061, #45 Doc 12830, #46 Doc 12853, #47 Doc 12971, #48 Doc 13329, #49 Doc 15098, #50 Doc 15176, #51 Doc 16343, #52 Doc 17494) (SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 PERTINENT FILINGS from MDL Docket (Attachments: #1 MDL abbreviated docket sheet, #2 Transfer Order, Doc 21472)(SMS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02321. File received electronically [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
March 26, 2020 REMARK: Case Transferred to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2321-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15762098 filed by Keith Dingman, Susan Dingman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 6/11/2020.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dingman et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Dingman
Represented By: Eric D. Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dingman
Represented By: Eric D. Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?