Gerlis v. New York State Department of Health
Plaintiff: Sean Gerlis
Defendant: New York State Department of Health
Case Number: 7:2020cv05107
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant shall answer or move by September 14, 2020. The Clerk is instructed to terminate ECF No. 6.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/7/2020) New York State Department of Health answer due 9/14/2020 (ks)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Nia Stanford dated August 6, 2020. Document filed by New York State Department of Health..(Stanford, Nia)
July 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew Rozynski to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Health, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Gerlis..(Rozynski, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2020 (pc).
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Health. (gp)
July 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
July 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
July 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Health, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Gerlis..(Rozynski, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozynski, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York State Department of Health. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20533879)Document filed by Sean Gerlis..(Rozynski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerlis v. New York State Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Gerlis
Represented By: Andrew Rozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Nia Rene Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?