Salerno v. The Coca-Cola Company
Plaintiff: Monique Salerno
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv05235
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Coca-Cola's planned motion to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Steven A. Zalesin dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by The Coca-Cola Company..(Zalesin, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 8, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 7:20-cv-0594. (sjo)
July 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-00711. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 7, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The #12 letter consenting to the transfer this action to the Southern District of New York is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/7/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 Letter in Response to Defendant's June 30, 2020 Request for Pre-Motion Conference (ECF No. 11) and Consenting to Transfer by Monique Salerno (Reese, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by The Coca-Cola Company. (Zalesin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Coca-Cola Company identifying Corporate Parent no parent corporation for The Coca-Cola Company. (Zalesin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Metcalf on behalf of The Coca-Cola Company (aty to be noticed) (Metcalf, Jane) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Alan Zalesin on behalf of The Coca-Cola Company (aty to be noticed) (Zalesin, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for July 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Peggy Kuo has been converted from an in-person conference to a Telephone Conference. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure defendant is aware of this conference change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/1/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference is adjourned to July 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure defendant is aware of this conference change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/4/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
May 2, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference of May 12, 2020 by Monique Salerno. (Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
May 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monique Salerno. The Coca-Cola Company waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for May 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Peggy Kuo has been converted from an in-person conference to a Telephone Conference. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. All counsel are required to attend. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure Defendant is aware of this conference change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/21/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on May 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to ensure that defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/10/2020. (Riquelme, Claudia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Coca-Cola Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]
February 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Coca-Cola Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12362818 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Monique Salerno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salerno v. The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Jane Metcalf
Represented By: Steven Alan Zalesin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Salerno
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?