Green et al v. Catskill Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Cathleen Green, as parent and natural guardian of JJW, an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years and Cathleen Green
Defendant: Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD, St. Lukes Cornwall Hospital, Hudson River Healthcare, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Florence Lazaroff, MD, Crystal Run Healthcare, Tapti Panda, MD and United States
Case Number: 7:2020cv05525
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United States..(Cowart, Brandon)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION AND DISCONTINUACE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, by their respective counsel, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) and 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(l), as follows: The United States is substituted as defendant in place of defendants Hudson River Healthcare, Inc. and Patrina Natasha Phillip-King. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants Hudson River Healthcare, Inc. and Patrina Natasha Phillip-King in this action are dismissed without prejudice, and as further specified and set forth in this Stipulation and Order of Substitution and Discontinuance. So ordered. United States added. Hudson River Healthcare and Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/17/2020) (rjm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Hudson River Healthcare, Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD..(Cowart, Brandon)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated 7/27/2020 re: Counsel for defendants write to respectfully request that the Federal Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint be extended by 30 days, from July 27 to August 26, 2020, to provide time to resolve this case without the need of motion practice. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So Ordered. Hudson River Healthcare answer due 8/26/2020; Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD answer due 8/26/2020. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/27/2020) (js)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucille A. Fontana on behalf of Cathleen Green..(Fontana, Lucille)
July 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (wb)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wayne Mitchell Rubin on behalf of Crystal Run Healthcare, Florence Lazaroff, MD, Tapti Panda, MD..(Rubin, Wayne)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cathleen Green, as parent and natural guardian of JJW, an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF007542-2019..Document filed by Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD, Hudson River Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Employment Certification)).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Catskill Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Green, as parent and natural guardian of JJW, an infant under the age of fourteen (14) years
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Green
Represented By: Lucille A. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrina Natasha Phillip-King, MD
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Lukes Cornwall Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson River Healthcare
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catskill Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Lazaroff, MD
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Run Healthcare
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapti Panda, MD
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?