Melohn v. Stern et al
Petitioner: Michael Melohn
Respondent: JOHN DOES 1-20 (Fictitious Names), Eli Kuntslinger, Robert Kuntslinger, Sima Weintraub, Alfons Melohn, Akiva N. Feinsod, Yaakov Beyman, Ezra Beyman, Sy Stern, David Teiler, Aryeh Zaks, John Does 1-20, Akiva Feinsod and Rabbi Mayer Zaks
Case Number: 7:2020cv05536
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE re: #27 Amended Petition, Response of Ezra Beyman, Yaakov Beyman and David Teiler to Amended Petition for Pre-Action Discovery. Document filed by David Teiler..(Schneider, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Adam B. Gilbert in Support re: #37 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11.. Document filed by Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Melohn Order of Protection, #2 Exhibit B-Melohn - Letter to B. Condon 7.24.20, #3 Exhibit C-Melohn v Stern et al. USDC SDNY).(Gilbert, Adam)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11. . Document filed by Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern..(Gilbert, Adam)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11. Document filed by Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern..(Gilbert, Adam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Amended Petition for Pre-Action Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 27 on August 18, 2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern..(Gilbert, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Response to Petition, Notices of Appearance served on Sima Weintraub, Yaakov Beyman, David Teiler, Eli Kuntslinger, Ezra Beyman, Rabbi Mayer Zaks on August 14, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Akiva Feinsod..(Gagliardi, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel John Gagliardi on behalf of Akiva Feinsod..(Gagliardi, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bernard Daskal on behalf of Akiva Feinsod..(Daskal, Bernard)
August 7, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Petition. Document filed by Akiva Feinsod..(Daskal, Bernard)
August 7, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE re: #27 Amended Petition, to "Amended Petition for Pre-Action Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 27". Document filed by Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern..(Gilbert, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Brenner Gilbert on behalf of Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern..(Gilbert, Adam)
July 28, 2020 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rabbi Mayer Zaks. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rabbi Mayer Zaks, re: #27 Amended Petition,. Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition (Other) against Ezra Beyman, Yaakov Beyman, Akiva Feinsod, John Does 1-20, Eli Kuntslinger, Robert Kuntslinger, Alfons Melohn, Sy Stern, David Teiler, Sima Weintraub, Rabbi Mayer Zaks with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael Melohn. Related document: #1 Petition (Other)..(Condon, Brian)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition removing One Party and Adding another Party. The application to amend the caption and file and serve the Amended Petition in the form annexed to petitioner's letter-motion is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/27/2020) (jca)
July 24, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition removing One Party and Adding another Party addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Brian K. Condon dated July 23, 2020. Document filed by Michael Melohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Petition).(Condon, Brian)
July 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian K Condon to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses may only be issured to parties of record; party name must appear exactly as it does in the caption on the pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eli Kuntslinger..(jgo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Condon, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eli Kunstlinger, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elliot Kuntslinger, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian) Modified on 7/21/2020 (jgo).
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian K Condon to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses may only be issured to parties of record; party name must appear exactly as it does in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alfons Melohn..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ezra Beyman..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Kuntslinger..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Teiler..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yaakov Beyman..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Akiva Feinsod..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sima Weintraub..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aryeh Zaks..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sy Stern..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brian K Condon. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian K Condon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN DOES 1-20 (Fictitious Names) ; Akiva N. Feinsod. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alfons Melohn, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ezra Beyman, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Kunstlinger, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Teiler, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yaakov Beyman, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elliot Kunstlinger, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian) Modified on 7/20/2020 (dnh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Akiva Feinsod, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sima Weintraub, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aryeh Zaks, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sy Stern, re: #1 Petition (Other). Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR PRE-ACTION DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 27. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20738840).Document filed by Michael Melohn..(Condon, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melohn v. Stern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOES 1-20 (Fictitious Names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eli Kuntslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Kuntslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sima Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alfons Melohn
Represented By: Adam Brenner Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Akiva N. Feinsod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yaakov Beyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ezra Beyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sy Stern
Represented By: Adam Brenner Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Teiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aryeh Zaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Akiva Feinsod
Represented By: Bernard Daskal
Represented By: Daniel John Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rabbi Mayer Zaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Melohn
Represented By: Brian K Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?