Riina v. Westchester Modular Homes
Plaintiff: Joesph Riina
Defendant: Westchester Modular Homes, Westchester Modular Homes Inc and Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp.
Case Number: 7:2020cv05682
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Westchester Modular Homes served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Westchester Modular Homes Inc served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service was accepted by Marianne Fahey. Service was made by Treaaurer. Document filed by Joesph Riina..(Wotorson, Ambrose)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester Modular Homes, Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp., Westchester Modular Homes Inc..(jgo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Westchester Modular Homes, Westchester Modular Homes Inc and Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp., re: #3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Joesph Riina..(Wotorson, Ambrose)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Westchester Modular Homes, Westchester Modular Homes Inc, Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Joesph Riina. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Wotorson, Ambrose)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wotorson, Ambrose)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ambrose Wotor Wotorson, Jr. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ambrose Wotor Wotorson, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westchester Modular Homes. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20811998)Document filed by Joesph Riina..(Wotorson, Ambrose)
July 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ambrose Wotor Wotorson, Jr. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ambrose Wotor Wotorson, Jr to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/28/2020. (dnh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riina v. Westchester Modular Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joesph Riina
Represented By: Ambrose Wotor Wotorson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Modular Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Modular Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Modular Homes Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?