Gross v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Gary R Gross and Gary R Gross
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Mr. Mark L Garcia and Mark L Garcia
Case Number: 7:2020cv05809
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Mark L Garcia served on 9/7/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service was accepted by Idalia Garcia - Grandmother. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. United States Postal Service served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Service was accepted by Judith Sullivan. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service..(jgo)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Mark L. Garcia and United States Postal Service, re: #6 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Gary R Gross. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Doc. 6 accepted as Second Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/10/2020) (kv)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Lawrence A. Breslow dated August 10, 2020 re: Filing errors. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service..(pc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #5 Amended Complaint against Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service.Document filed by Gary R Gross. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint..(Breslow, Lawrence) Modified on 8/10/2020 (pc). Modified on 8/11/2020 (jgo).
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint against Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service.Document filed by Gary R Gross. Related document: #2 Complaint..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark L. Garcia and United States Postal Service, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lawrence A. Breslow to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party names in the 'To:' section of the summons PDF must appear exactly as the do in the pleading caption with no abbreviations. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence A. Breslow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332; Nature of Suit code 350 (Motor Vehicle); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1391; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 360 (P.I.: Other); the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
August 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lawrence A. Breslow. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gary R Gross. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark L. Garcia and United States Postal Service, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence) Modified on 8/5/2020 (dnh).
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service. Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence)
July 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lawrence A. Breslow to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/5/2020. (pc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Mark L Garcia, United States Postal Service. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20927870)Document filed by Gary R Gross..(Breslow, Lawrence) Modified on 7/31/2020 (pc).
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lawrence A. Breslow. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lawrence A. Breslow to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/3/2020. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Gary R Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R Gross
Represented By: Lawrence A. Breslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mark L Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?