Wongsing v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
Plaintiff: Laura Wongsing
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. and Walmart Supercenter Store #2104
Case Number: 7:2020cv06029
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 12/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. The parties request that expert discovery be held in abeyance pending a decision on defendant's expected Rule 56 motion. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/28/2020) (mml)
August 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 8/28/2020. Plaintiff's counsel Funsho Ilori, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel Patricia O'Connor, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Ryan Partelow appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules the next status conference for January 27, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by January 13, 2021; opposition due January 20, 2021. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angie Shaw-Crockett) (wc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Funsho Ilori on behalf of Laura Wongsing..(Ilori, Funsho)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP..(O'Connor, Patricia)
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (nb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a telephone conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on August 28, 2020 at 3:45 p.m. (via telephone) in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. (nb) Modified on 8/11/2020 (nb).
August 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patricia A. O'Connor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Orange. Case Number: EF002151-2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20971547).Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Response).(O'Connor, Patricia)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104.(O'Connor, Patricia)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate Seiyu for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104. Document filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104..(O'Connor, Patricia)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wongsing v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wongsing
Represented By: Funsho Ilori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Supercenter Store #2104
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP i/s/h/a Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter Store #2104
Represented By: Patricia A. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?