Abramsky v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shoshanah Abramsky
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv06619
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY AGREED TO by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action against Defendants shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/08/2020) (ama)
October 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): and that judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. (km)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Deutsch, Raphael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky..(Deutsch, Raphael)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Raphael Deutsch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Sullivan;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Deutsch, Raphael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21221790)Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Deutsch, Raphael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abramsky v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshanah Abramsky
Represented By: Raphael Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?