Aleja Manufacturing, Inc. v. POP Displays USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: POP Displays USA, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv06630
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to POP Displays USA, LLC.(km)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Christie R McGuinness in Support re: #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(McGuinness, Christie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc...(McGuinness, Christie) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
October 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christie McGuinness to RE-FILE Document #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Use the event type other answers, declaration in support of a non-motion. (km)
October 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Chrisite McGuinness. RE-FILE Document No. #14 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. The request to enter default is no longer needed. Please use the sample clerk's certificate that is on our website under forms, the one that was filed is not as to form. File the clerk's certificate under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default. (km)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(McGuinness, Christie) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/7/2020 (km).
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Certification of Default).(McGuinness, Christie) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/7/2020 (km).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Accordingly, provided that defendant remains in default, plaintiff is ORDERED to seek a certificate of default as to defendant by October 8, 2020, and thereafter to move, by order to show cause and in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices, for default judgment against defendant by October 22, 2020. If plaintiff fails to satisfy either deadline, the Court may dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute or failure to comply with court orders. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 10/22/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/1/2020) (mml)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. POP Displays USA, LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an agent of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc...(McGuinness, Christie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. APPLICATION GRANTED. Although the relevant documents are judicial documents subject to a common law and First Amendment presumption in favor of public access, Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006), the Court finds plaintiff has shown a sufficient basis to justify filing under seal the exhibits to the complaint. The Clerk is directed to seal Exhibits A, B, and C of Plaintiff's complaint, (Docs. #10-2, 10-3, 10-4), and terminate the letter motions (Docs. #9, 10). (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/2/2020) (nb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Complaint Under Seal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Aleja Manufacturing Inc. dated 09/01/2020. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Seal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(McGuinness, Christie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Complaint Under Seal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Aleja Manufacturing Inc. dated 09/01/2020. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C).(McGuinness, Christie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Aleja Manufacturing Inc. dated 08/27/2020 re: POP Displays USA LLC's citizenship. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(O'Reilly, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, by August 28, 2020, plaintiff's counsel shall submit a letter explaining in detail the basis for defendant's citizenship. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/21/2020) (mml)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. O'Reilly on behalf of Aleja Manufacturing, Inc...(O'Reilly, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to POP Displays USA, LLC..(pc)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc...(McGuinness, Christie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to POP Displays USA, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc...(McGuinness, Christie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGuinness, Christie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against POP Displays USA, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21227336)Document filed by Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Agreement, #2 Exhibit The Amendment, #3 Exhibit).(McGuinness, Christie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aleja Manufacturing, Inc. v. POP Displays USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleja Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Christie Rita McGuinness
Represented By: Michael S. O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POP Displays USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?