In Re: McFall
Appellee: Donise R. McFall
Appellant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 7:2020cv06685
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. Appellee Brief due by 10/30/2020..(Cowart, Brandon)
September 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 9/30/2020. (jca)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief. The application is granted. The Court kindly requests the Clerk of the Court to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/25/2020) (jca)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated September 24, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Cowart, Brandon)
September 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2020. (jwh)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/21/2020) (jwh)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated September 17, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Cowart, Brandon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 9/21/2020. (bkgc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkgc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Document filed by Appellant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (bkgc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated May 13, 2020 & July 2, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-B-35590(CGM). Document filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development.(bkgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donise R. McFall
Represented By: Andrea B. Malin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?