Sandoz Inc. v. Medwiz Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Unknown Members of Medwiz Solutions, LLC, Medwiz Solutions, LLC, Batya Gorelick and Blanche Reiss
Case Number: 7:2020cv06943
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (ad)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Blanche Reiss served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. Service was accepted by Devorah "Doe", Co-Resident. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Batya Gorelick served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Maria Castro, Co-Resident. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Medwiz Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wong, Linda)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Medwiz Solutions, LLC..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blanche Reiss..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Batya Gorelick..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Linda Wong to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Sandoz Inc.. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Blanche Reiss, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Medwiz Solutions, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Batya Gorelick, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Wong, Linda)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wong, Linda) Modified on 8/28/2020 (jgo).
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Batya Gorelick, Medwiz Solutions, LLC, Blanche Reiss, Unknown Members of Medwiz Solutions, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21363654)Document filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Wong, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoz Inc. v. Medwiz Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Members of Medwiz Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medwiz Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batya Gorelick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanche Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Linda Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?