Murray v. DCH Toyota City
Plaintiff: Sean Michael Murray
Defendant: DCH Toyota City, DCH Auto Group and Toyota City, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv07383
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCH Auto Group, Toyota City, Inc...(jgo)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCH Toyota City..(jgo)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Toyota City, Inc., DCH Auto Group, re: #12 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to DCH Toyota City, re: #12 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David)
October 16, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [16 and 17] Summons and Amended Summons. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filing Court is listed as Eastern District. (sj)
October 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Amended summonses are issued to parties previously issued one; a standard is required for new parties; the amended summons and standard summons must be filed separately. (pc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Toyota City, Inc., DCH Auto Group, re: #12 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/15/2020 (pc).
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to DCH Toyota City, re: #12 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/15/2020 (pc).
October 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Amended summonses are issued to parties previously issued one; a standard is required for new parties; the amended summons and standard summons must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to DCH Toyota, Toyota City, Inc.and DCH Auto Group, re: #12 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/13/2020 (sj).
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint,, against DCH Auto Group, DCH Toyota City, Toyota City, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC, #4 Exhibit Ex. "D" January 9, 2020 Refund check).(Kasell, David)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong parties as to whom the summons request is for was selected; Amended summonses are issued to parties previously issued one; DCH Toyota in not listed on pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to DCH Toyota, Toyota City, Inc.and DCH Auto Group, re: #10 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/6/2020 (sj).
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint against DCH Auto Group, DCH Toyota City, Toyota City, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC, #4 Exhibit Ex. "D" January 9, 2020 Refund check).(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/6/2020 (sj).
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; a standard summons must be requested for new parties using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons and an amended summons must be requested for parties whom a summons has been previously issued for using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons; summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Toyota City, Inc.and DCH Auto Group, re: #8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. Related document: #4 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC, #4 Exhibit Ex. "D" January 9, 2020 Refund check).(Kasell, David) Modified on 10/2/2020 (jgo).
September 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Court's leave has not been granted. There was no first amended complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (pc)
September 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Michael Kasell to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Waiver of Service,, Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #6 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David) Modified on 9/30/2020 (pc).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE -SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint, against Toyota City, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. Related document: #4 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC, #4 Exhibit Ex. "D" January 9, 2020 Refund check).(Kasell, David) Modified on 9/30/2020 (pc).
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DCH Toyota City..(pc)
September 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Michael Kasell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code m (Mandatory); County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Albany;. (pc)
September 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Michael Kasell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sean Michael Murray, DCH Toyota City. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against DCH Toyota City. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC, #4 Exhibit Ex. "D" January 9, 2020 Refund check).(Kasell, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DCH Toyota City, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray..(Kasell, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kasell, David)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against DCH Toyota City. Document filed by Sean Michael Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Receipt for $500 downpayment, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" First RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Second RISC).(Kasell, David) Modified on 9/10/2020 (jgo).
September 10, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-21589716, paid on 9/10/2020..(jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. DCH Toyota City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCH Toyota City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCH Auto Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Michael Murray
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?