Martinez v. Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo Martinez
Defendant: Joseph John Tartaglia, M.D., P.C., Yazhou Zhang, D.D.S., Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc., John Joseph Tartaglia, M.D., P.C., Naida Henriquez, D.M.D., Jonathon A. Herbst, M.D., Joseph J. Tartaglia, M.D. and John Joseph Tartaglia, M.D.
Case Number: 7:2020cv08118
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1ZE22E533710050561 on 11/9/2020..(ks)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, by their respective counsel, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), as follows: 2. prejudice. The United States is substituted as defendant in place of the Federal Defendants. Plaintiff's claims against the United States in this action are dismissed without 3. This action is hereby remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, as there is no longer federal subject matter jurisdiction due to the dismissal of the Federal Defendants. 4. This Stipulation and Order of Dismissal (the "Stipulation and Order") may be executed in counterparts; a reproduced signature shall have the same force and effect as an original signature; and a facsimile or electronic copy of the Stipulation and Order shall have the same force and effect as an original. 5. The undersigned parties understand and agree that the Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the undersigned parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/6/2020) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Guillermo Martinez..(Coscia, Christine)
October 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 5, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-04007-PMH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Philip M. Halpern as possibly related to :19-cv-4007 (PMH). (gp)
October 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
October 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-CV-4007 (PMH). Document filed by Naida Henriquez, D.M.D., Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc...(Cowart, Brandon)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 805267/2018..Document filed by Naida Henriquez, D.M.D., Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Employment Certification)).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph John Tartaglia, M.D., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yazhou Zhang, D.D.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Door Family Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Tartaglia, M.D., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naida Henriquez, D.M.D.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon A. Herbst, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Tartaglia, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Tartaglia, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?