Seward v. Antonini et al
Plaintiff: Alan Seward
Defendant: Det. Camilo R. Antonini, P.O. Robert G. Puff, Det. Sgt. Sean J. Fegan, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers, The City of Mount Vernon, P.O. Michael Hutchins, Police Commissioner Glenn Scott, P.O. Ravin Palmer, P.O. Patrick King, P.O. Joseph Valente, Sgt. Jose Quinoy, Police Commissioner Shawn Harris, P.O. Sebastian Salazar and P.O. Robert F. Kressman
Case Number: 7:2020cv09251
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Tara Elizabeth Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22993091. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Seward. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 Declaration of Tara Thompson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Tara Thompson).(Thompson, Tara)
December 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Tara Elizabeth Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22993091. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so redesignated. (ad)
November 25, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, alleging constitutional violations by the Police Department of Mt. Vernon, New York. On November 9, 2020, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be reassigned to White Plains pursuant to Local Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges 18 and 19. ECF No. 4. On November 20, 2020, Plaintiff responded that it agreed reassignment to White Plains is required by these rules. ECF No. 22. Therefore, the Court hereby transfers this matter to White Plains pursuant to Local Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges 18 and 19. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/24/2020) (nb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joseph Valente waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Glenn Scott waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sebastian Salazar waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jose Quinoy waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert G. Puff waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ravin Palmer waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The City of Mount Vernon waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert F. Kressman waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Patrick King waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Hutchins waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shawn Harris waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sean J. Fegan waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Camilo R. Antonini waiver sent on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Kelly Schieffer on behalf of Camilo R. Antonini, Sean J. Fegan, Shawn Harris, Michael Hutchins, Patrick King, Robert F. Kressman, Ravin Palmer, Robert G. Puff, Jose Quinoy, Sebastian Salazar, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, Joseph Valente, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers..(Schieffer, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Joseph Bushnell on behalf of Camilo R. Antonini, Sean J. Fegan, Shawn Harris, Michael Hutchins, Patrick King, Robert F. Kressman, Ravin Palmer, Robert G. Puff, Jose Quinoy, Sebastian Salazar, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, Joseph Valente, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers..(Bushnell, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. DiFiore on behalf of Camilo R. Antonini, Sean J. Fegan, Shawn Harris, Michael Hutchins, Patrick King, Robert F. Kressman, Ravin Palmer, Robert G. Puff, Jose Quinoy, Sebastian Salazar, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, Joseph Valente, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers..(DiFiore, Anthony)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Quinn on behalf of Camilo R. Antonini, Sean J. Fegan, Shawn Harris, Michael Hutchins, Patrick King, Robert F. Kressman, Ravin Palmer, Robert G. Puff, Jose Quinoy, Sebastian Salazar, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, Joseph Valente, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers..(Quinn, Andrew)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Complaint in this matter relates to alleged misconduct by the Mount Vernon Police Department allegedly perpetrated against residents of Mount Vernon. ECF No. 1. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be reassigned to White Plains pursuant to Local Rules for the Division of Business Among District Judges 18 and 19. Such showing should be made by written response by November 23, 2020. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/9/2020) (js)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Newirth, Karen)
November 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karen Anne Newirth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
November 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Karen Anne Newirth to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption. If all of the party names do not fit, use leading party name followed by 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr)
November 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Newirth, Karen) Modified on 11/5/2020 (jgo).
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Camilo R. Antonini, Sean J. Fegan, Shawn Harris, Michael Hutchins, Patrick King, Robert F. Kressman, Ravin Palmer, Robert G. Puff, Jose Quinoy, Sebastian Salazar, Glenn Scott, The City of Mount Vernon, Joseph Valente, unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22441494)Document filed by Alan Seward..(Newirth, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seward v. Antonini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Camilo R. Antonini
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Robert G. Puff
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Sgt. Sean J. Fegan
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unidentified Mount Vernon Police Department employees and officers
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Mount Vernon
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Michael Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Glenn Scott
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Ravin Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Patrick King
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Joseph Valente
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jose Quinoy
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Commissioner Shawn Harris
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Sebastian Salazar
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Robert F. Kressman
Represented By: Matthew Kelly Schieffer
Represented By: Anthony J. DiFiore
Represented By: Andrew C Quinn
Represented By: Steven Joseph Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Seward
Represented By: Karen Anne Newirth
Represented By: Tara Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?