Crawford v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jacob Crawford
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 7:2020cv09283
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. United States Of America served on 11/12/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jacob Crawford..(Dratch, Brian)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(pc)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacob Crawford..(Dratch, Brian)
November 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian Michael Dratch to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names must EXACTLY match what is listed on the complaint caption title (no acronyms);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Michael Dratch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacob Crawford..(Dratch, Brian) Modified on 11/6/2020 (pc).
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dratch, Brian)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22451705)Document filed by Jacob Crawford..(Dratch, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Crawford
Represented By: Brian Michael Dratch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?