Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC v. UMR, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc. and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv09642
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/11/2021) (jca)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Richard Hochhauser dated January 11, 2021. Document filed by Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC..(Hochhauser, Richard)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2021. (jca)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. Congratulations on the new arrival. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 1/11/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/4/2021) (mml)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 LETTER MOTION for Conference : Request for a pre-motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Richard Hochhauser and addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew P. Mazzola dated December 22, 2 020 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Richard Hochhauser dated January 4, 2021. Document filed by Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC..(Hochhauser, Richard)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference : Request for a pre-motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss addressed to Richard Hochhauser and addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew P. Mazzola dated December 22, 2020. Document filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreements, #2 Exhibit B-Appeal Letter, #3 Certificate of Service).(Mazzola, Matthew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal. Granted. SO ORDERED. UMR, Inc. answer due 12/23/2020; United Healthcare Services, Inc. answer due 12/23/2020. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/9/2020) (jca)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal,, : Request to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on consent addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mathew P. Mazzola dated December 8, 2020. Document filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc...(Mazzola, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Paul Mazzola on behalf of UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc...(Mazzola, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael H Bernstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court);. (jgo)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on Richard A. Hochhauser, Esq. on November 17, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc...(Bernstein, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: Index No. 62772/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22619162).Document filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Articles of Origanization, #4 Exhibit D-Address Search, #5 Exhibit E-Business Record Details, #6 Exhibit F-Entity Information).(Bernstein, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC v. UMR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Bernstein
Represented By: Matthew Paul Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Bernstein
Represented By: Matthew Paul Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Neurosurgey, PLLC
Represented By: Richard A. Hochhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?