McGinnis et al v. Village of Monticello et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Galati and Stefon McGinnis
Defendant: Raymond Jones and Village of Monticello
Case Number: 7:2020cv09786
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Raymond Jones answer due 2/2/2021; Village of Monticello answer due 2/2/2021 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/14/2021) (jca)
January 14, 2021 Filing 18 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Leo Dorfman dated 01/14/2021. Document filed by Raymond Jones..(Dorfman, Leo)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter filed by Village of Monticello. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Raymond Jones answer due 1/19/2021; Village of Monticello answer due 1/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/21/2020) (jca)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Dorfman on behalf of Raymond Jones..(Dorfman, Leo)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Adam L. Rodd, Esq. dated December 21, 2020 re: requesting an extension of time to answer or respond to plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Village of Monticello..(Rodd, Adam)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Billig Louglin & Silver LLP on December 16, 2020. Document filed by Village of Monticello..(Rodd, Adam)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Rodd on behalf of Village of Monticello..(Rodd, Adam)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Raymond Jones served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. Service was accepted by Raymond Jones. Document filed by Stefon McGinnis; Danielle Galati..(Silver, Gary)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Village of Monticello served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. Service was accepted by George Nikolados, Mayor. Document filed by Stefon McGinnis; Danielle Galati..(Silver, Gary)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raymond Jones..(dnh)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond Jones, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Village of Monticello..(jgo)
November 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary D. Silver to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Village of Monticello, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond Jones, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary) Modified on 11/24/2020 (jgo).
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary) Modified on 11/24/2020 (jgo).
November 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary D. Silver. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the County code has been modified to Sullivan; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gary D. Silver to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title must be the same for each summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Silver, Gary)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond Jones, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary) Modified on 11/23/2020 (pc).
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Village of Monticello, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Danielle Galati, Stefon McGinnis..(Silver, Gary) Modified on 11/23/2020 (pc).
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond Jones, Village of Monticello. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22679500)Document filed by Stefon McGinnis, Danielle Galati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NYSDHR Dismissal, #2 Exhibit EEOC Dismissal).(Silver, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis et al v. Village of Monticello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Jones
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Monticello
Represented By: Adam Rodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Galati
Represented By: Gary D. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefon McGinnis
Represented By: Gary D. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?