American Christmas, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: American Christmas, LLC
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company and American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv10772
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 05:8705
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Alderman, Todd)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Alderman, Todd)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application is GRANTED. Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company is permitted to to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 26, 2021. Defendant is reminded that, to the extent it intends to respond to the Complaint through motion practice, it is required to comply with this Court's local rules, including by first submitting a letter requesting a pre-motion conference. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 12. So Ordered. (Mt. Hawley Insurance Company answer due 2/26/2021.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/25/21) (yv)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Timothy E. Delahunt dated 01/22/2021. Document filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corp., Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Document filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application is GRANTED. Defendant American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company is permitted to to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 12, 2021. Defendant is reminded that, to the extent it intends to respond to the Complaint through motion practice, it is required to comply with this Court's local rules, including by first submitting a letter requesting a pre-motion conference. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7. So Ordered. ( American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company answer due 2/12/2021.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/20/21) (yv)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Erin Delahunt on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(Delahunt, Timothy)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David McKenna on behalf of American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(McKenna, John)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Letter to be So Ordered addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Todd M. Alderman dated 1/13/2021. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(Alderman, Todd)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company..(jgo)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(jgo)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MT. HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Christmas, LLC..(Forino, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Christmas, LLC..(Forino, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Forino, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23132233)Document filed by American Christmas, LLC..(Forino, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Christmas, LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Christmas, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Forino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Erin Delahunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Alderman
Represented By: John David McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?