First American Title Insurance Company v. MacGregor Abstract Corp
Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Defendant: MacGregor Abstract Corp
Case Number: 7:2021cv00345
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. MacGregor Abstract Corp served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by First American Title Insurance Company..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Christina Watson on behalf of First American Title Insurance Company..(Watson, Lauren)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jaimee Lynn Katz Sussner on behalf of First American Title Insurance Company. New Address: Sills Cummis & Gross, P.C., One Riverfront Plaza, Newark, NJ, United States 07102, 9736437000..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MacGregor Abstract Corp..(pc)
January 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MacGregor Abstract Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by First American Title Insurance Company..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company. Document filed by First American Title Insurance Company..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MacGregor Abstract Corp. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23516104)Document filed by First American Title Insurance Company..(Katz Sussner, Jaimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First American Title Insurance Company v. MacGregor Abstract Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacGregor Abstract Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Jaimee Lynn Katz Sussner
Represented By: Lauren Christina Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?