Shields v. Kwon, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Shields, as Administrator of the Estate Arleen Shields and Robert A. Shields
Defendant: Johnny Kwon, M.D. and Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital
Case Number: 7:2021cv00552
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/17/2021) (mml)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move for remand addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Edward P. Milstein dated 3-17-2021. Document filed by Robert A. Shields..(Milstein, Edward)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/9/2021) (jca)
March 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/1/2021. Responses due by 7/1/2021, Replies due by 7/22/2021. (jca)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Phillip Milstein on behalf of Robert A. Shields..(Milstein, Edward)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from John O'Sullivan dated 03/09/2021. Document filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital..(O'Sullivan, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital. ENDORSEMENT: Because Plaintiff did not bother to respond, the Defense Motion may be filed by 4/1/21, Plaintiff's response is due 5/1/21, Defense reply is due 5/22/21. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/1/2021, Responses due by 5/1/2021, Replies due by 5/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/1/2021) (jca)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is to respond to this letter by 2/25/21. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/19/2021) (jca)
February 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John O'Sullivan to RE-FILE Document #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from John P. O'Sullivan dated 1/28/2021 re: Notice of Removal and Req for Pre Motion Conference. Document filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital..(O'Sullivan, John)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Leonard Gallo, Jr on behalf of Johnny Kwon, M.D...(Gallo, Vincent)
January 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Sullivan, John)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital..(O'Sullivan, John) Modified on 2/9/2021 (ldi).
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 65827/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23624987).Document filed by Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C filed in Westchester Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Affids of Service - Dr. Kwon, #3 Exhibit Stip Extending for Def to Answer Complaint, #4 Exhibit CoDef Answer).(O'Sullivan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Kwon, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Kwon, M.D.
Represented By: Vincent Leonard Gallo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital
Represented By: John O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Shields, as Administrator of the Estate Arleen Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Shields
Represented By: Edward Phillip Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?