Hutcheson v. New York Medical College et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Hutcheson
Defendant: New York Medical College, ABC CORPS. 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown), JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown), AMY RAZUKIEWICZ, Sarah Cottet, John and Jane Does 1-10 and ABC Corps. 1-10
Case Number: 7:2021cv00639
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sarah Cottet, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz..(Woodard, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent New York Medical College, LLC, Corporate Parent Toro College for New York Medical College. Document filed by New York Medical College..(Woodard, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Matthew Howard Woodard to RE-FILE Document #19 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sarah Cottet answer due 3/24/2021; New York Medical College answer due 3/24/2021; Amy Razukiewicz answer due 3/24/2021. (jca)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/2/2021) (jca)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arin Mossovitz Liebman on behalf of Sarah Cottet, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz..(Liebman, Arin)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew H. Woodard dated 3/2/2021. Document filed by Sarah Cottet, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz..(Woodard, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Sarah Cottet, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz..(Woodard, Matthew) Modified on 3/11/2021 (lb).
March 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Howard Woodard on behalf of Sarah Cottet, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz..(Woodard, Matthew)
February 22, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah Cottet..(pc)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Sarah Cottet, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Medical College served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Razukiewicz. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amy Razukiewicz served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Razukiewicz. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sarah Cottet..(dnh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarah Cottet, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #9 Complaint against ABC Corps. 1-10, Sarah Cottet, John and Jane Does 1-10, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson. Related document: #9 Complaint..(Sekas, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicholas George Sekas to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading; Amended pleading must be refiled in order for summons to be issued for named party;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sarah Cottet, re: #8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas) Modified on 2/8/2021 (jgo).
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against ABC Corps. 1-10, John and Jane Does 1-10, New York Medical College, Amy Razukiewicz. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
January 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicholas George Sekas to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the parties must be individually selected; the Complaint must be properly filed in order for the Amended Complaint to be accepted by the Court. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #6 Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson. Related document: #6 Complaint..(Sekas, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jgo).
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sekas, Nicholas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jgo).
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Medical College..(jgo)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amy Razukiewicz..(jgo)
January 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas George Sekas. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMY RAZUKIEWICZ; ABC CORPS. 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown); JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text contained a typographical error; party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo)
January 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas George Sekas. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
January 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas George Sekas to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF must be filed separately; Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
January 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicholas George Sekas to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amy Razukiewicz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Medical College, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson..(Sekas, Nicholas)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brenda Hutcheson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23671214)Document filed by Brenda Hutcheson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Sekas, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutcheson v. New York Medical College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Medical College
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Represented By: Matthew Howard Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY RAZUKIEWICZ
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Represented By: Matthew Howard Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Cottet
Represented By: Arin Mossovitz Liebman
Represented By: Matthew Howard Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hutcheson
Represented By: Nicholas George Sekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?